CHURT RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of Recreation Ground and Buildings thereon
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 28 July 1961: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roderick Barrow | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Harrison | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Shorthose | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Stephen Wright | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Martin | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Raeside | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julian Spence | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Myra Johnson | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
SALLY SHORTHOSE | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|||||
DAWN BARROW | Trustee | 02 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.05k | £38.45k | £21.53k | £19.35k | £24.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.68k | £27.28k | £24.77k | £18.74k | £20.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.61k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 30 NOVEMBER 1923
Charitable objects
A PUBLIC RECRETION GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JOHN THE EVANGELIST, CHURT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Paddock House
Churt Road
CHURT
FARNHAM
GU10 2NY
- Phone:
- 0766190201
- Email:
- parishclerk@churt.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window