Accounts and annual returns BOX HILL VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 305014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 March 2024 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 March 2024 498 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 March 2024 852 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 July 2023 975 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required