PUBLIC RECREATION OR PLAYING GROUND FOR THE INHABITANTS OF VIRGINIA WATER

Charity Number: 305020
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trust is responsible for the management of the open space playing area on Cabrera avenue and 52 acres of land next to the River Bourne known as Riverside walk.The trust requires that Riverside walk is maintained for the exercise, recreation and benefit of the inhabitants of Virginia water and the neighbourhood, and the open space on cabrera avenue is to be used as a public recreation ground

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £7,221
Total expenditure: £8,273

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 August 1961: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE CABRERA TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RUNNYMEDE BOROUGH COUNCIL Trustee 12 December 2012
EGHAM WAR MEMORIAL UPKEEP FUND
Received: On time
VICTORY PARK
Received: On time
ABBEY FIELD RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
SIR EDWARD DAVID STERN FOR RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
RUNNYMEDE PLEASURE GROUND
Received: On time
THE ORCHARD
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.34k £6.40k £6.36k £7.11k £7.22k
Total expenditure £16.48k £17.01k £15.93k £20.81k £8.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Runnymede Borough Council
Runnymede Civic Centre
Station Road
Addlestone
KT15 2AH
Phone:
01932 838383
Website:

No information available