FARNHAM MALTINGS ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Farnham Maltings is a cultural organisation that exists to encourage the people of Farnham and further afield to participate in, shape and understand the world in which we live. We organise our work in pursuit of our ambition to ensure that Farnham remains a happy, safe and creative community capable of supporting an organisation that enriches the cultural offer for the region.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,806,926
Donations and legacies | £15.06k | |
Charitable activities | £2.45m | |
Other trading activities | £319.25k | |
Investments | £21.63k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,240,013
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.24m | |
Other | £0 |
£19,840 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,110,289 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.24m |
People

74 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
88 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 13 January 1970: Standard registration
- FARNHAM MALTINGS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL MAHER | Chair | 21 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elsie Cheers | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|||||
David Harland | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Holly Dolan Shakeri | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Eleanor Bradshaw | Trustee | 06 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hedda Mary Bird | Trustee | 26 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Cummins | Trustee | 26 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Muaz Notiar | Trustee | 26 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Esther Wade | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerri-Ann O'Neill | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.91m | £2.38m | £2.75m | £2.77m | £2.81m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.01m | £1.87m | £2.32m | £2.91m | £3.24m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £999.50k | £1.25m | £1.27m | £1.05m | £1.11m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £35.91k | £30.46k | £64.81k | £17.25k | £15.06k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £287.31k | £141.63k | £242.71k | £277.75k | £319.25k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.58m | £1.76m | £2.41m | £2.47m | £2.45m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £7.66k | £1.09k | £196 | £4.59k | £21.63k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £445.96k | £34.33k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.01m | £1.87m | £2.32m | £2.91m | £3.24m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.00k | £5.00k | £11.01k | £36.22k | £13.59k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.39m | £1.41m | £1.41m | £1.47m | £1.46m | |
|
Long-term investments | £200.00k | £213.84k | £239.68k | £237.59k | £257.43k | |
|
Other assets | £1.11m | £1.64m | £2.21m | £2.06m | £1.75m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £267.05k | £282.30k | £411.96k | £452.14k | £452.45k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 February 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
15 February 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 April 2021 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/05/1969 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/09/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/11/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/11/2014 NULL AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 JAN 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE:- 1) TO ESTABLISH COMMUNITY CENTRES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE TOWN OF FARNHAM AFORESAID AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS AND LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE ARTS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, INCLUDING THE MUSICAL, VISUAL, DRAMATIC, CINEMATIC AND APPLIED ARTS. 3) GENERALLY TO ENCOURAGE, PROMOTE, UNDERTAKE OR CARRY ON OR ASSIST THE PROMOTION, UNDERTAKING OR CARRYING ON OF SUCH CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AND PURPOSES AS MAY PROMOTE THE ARTS AND STRENGTHEN THE BONDS OF COMMUNITY LIFE.
Area of benefit
FARNHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Farnham Maltings Ass'n Ltd
Bridge Square
FARNHAM
Surrey
GU9 7QR
- Phone:
- 01252745444
- Email:
- info@farnhammaltings.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window