Financial history CHRYSTIE RECREATION GROUND

Charity Number: 305053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.63k £2.10k £1.43k £0 £1.28k
Total expenditure £21.63k £23.39k £12.57k £2.76k £12.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A