MAYFORD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305075
Charity reporting is up to date (111 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Mayford Village Hall trustees run and maintain the hall for the residents of mayford, the hall is hired out to clubs and organisations,and also private lettings to use for entertainment and also educational activities, such as Pre-School.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £44,189
Total expenditure: £46,073

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 May 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Frances Moore Trustee 20 April 2023
None on record
Joanna Fisher Trustee 04 January 2021
None on record
ALEC MICHAEL JAMES ASHLEY Trustee 15 April 1993
None on record
ALAN JAMES BRIGGS Trustee
None on record
SUSIE PUNCH Trustee
None on record
LINDA HALL Trustee
None on record
PAUL ATKINS Trustee
None on record
JEAN CHEESEMAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £37.92k £28.33k £51.44k £42.60k £44.19k
Total expenditure £33.63k £33.74k £24.12k £71.66k £46.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.62k £10.62k £28.75k £2.67k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 February 2025 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 February 2025 111 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 21 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Mayford Village Hall
Saunders Lane
Mayford
WOKING
GU22 0NN
Phone:
07840894593
Email:
No information available