OXSHOTT TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity manages the Oxshott Village Centre and is landlord and licenser to the Oxshott Medical Practice and licenser to The Vernon Educational Trust, the licences being for the provision of car parking services and the use of a playing field.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 14 June 1965: Standard registration
- OXSHOTT VILLAGE CENTRE (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR GEOFF MOYLE | Chair |
|
||||||
Elizabeth McGibbon | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Michael Marsden | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Topp | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Dyson | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Donald Porter | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
stuart knee | Trustee | 09 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL CHARLES LANCASTER CARPENTER | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANGELA MARGARET HORNE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.48k | £77.27k | £97.16k | £115.22k | £142.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.75k | £35.43k | £46.05k | £48.39k | £65.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 17TH DECEMBER 1963 AND SCHEME OF 2ND JUNE 1992
Charitable objects
COMMUNITY CENTRE
Area of benefit
OXSHOTT AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE GATEHOUSE
QUEENS DRIVE
OXSHOTT
LEATHERHEAD
KT22 0PB
- Phone:
- 01372843844
- Email:
- geoffdot@ntlworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window