Financial history PYRFORD VILLAGE WAR MEMORIAL HALL

Charity Number: 305095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £34.06k £11.33k £28.26k £37.30k £59.49k
Total expenditure £24.51k £22.99k £24.44k £28.31k £66.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £16.64k