PYRFORD VILLAGE WAR MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To develop and enhance the facilities in the Village Hall for the use of the communities in Pyford and Woking
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £16,638 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 31 August 1961: Standard registration
- PYRFORD VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sonia Hanington | Chair | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Jane Matthews | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jill Margaret Brine | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary William Elson | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katharine WRIGHT | Trustee | 17 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Douglas Geaves | Trustee | 17 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ian MILLS | Trustee | 17 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.06k | £11.33k | £28.26k | £37.30k | £59.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.51k | £22.99k | £24.44k | £28.31k | £66.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.64k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE MINISTER OF EDUCATION DATED 13 DECEMBER 1950 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 17 APRIL 2000 AND BY RESOLUTION ADOPTED 23 MAY 2007.
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF LIBRARY READING, LECTURES, CLASSES, ENTERTAINMENTS AND RECREATION ROOMS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF PYRFORD AND IT IMMEDIATE VICINITY IN MEMORY OF THE GREAT WAR.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF PYRFORD AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pyrford Village War Memorial Hall
Coldharbour Road
Pyrford
Woking
Surrey
GU22 8SP
- Phone:
- 07751333812
- Email:
- pvhbookings@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window