Financial history REIGATE PARK AND PARK HILL

Charity number: 305109
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £32.32k £29.66k £32.06k £24.63k £27.04k
Total expenditure £32.32k £29.66k £32.06k £24.63k £26.27k
Income from government contracts N/A £29.42k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £32.00k N/A N/A