Financial history REIGATE PUBLIC BATHS

Charity number: 305110
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.58k £3.94k £1.04k £17.19k £12.50k
Total expenditure £8.58k £3.94k £1.04k £17.19k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A