SURREY ARMY CADET FORCE ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 305152
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grants in support of cadets in Surrey Army Cadet Force and other young people

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £40,030
Total expenditure: £53,844

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 February 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Neil Francis Harnby Trustee 27 May 2024
THE QUEEN'S ROYAL SURREY REGIMENT COMBINED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Colonel Alan Mulder Trustee 18 February 2022
None on record
Brigadier Paul Anthony Dennis Evans OBE DL Trustee 05 February 2019
THE ROYAL LOGISTIC CORPS CHARITY
Recently registered
COLONEL PATRICK TIMOTHY CROWLEY MBE DL Trustee 05 February 2019
PRINCESS OF WALES'S ROYAL REGIMENT (QUEEN'S AND ROYAL HAMPSHIRES) BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
THE QUEEN'S ROYAL SURREY REGIMENT COMBINED CHARITIES
Received: On time
SOUTH EAST RESERVES AND CADETS WELFARE FUND
Received: On time
MARTIN JOHN GERRARD DL Trustee 17 July 2013
2ND CUDDINGTON (ROWE) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
THE AGOONOREE (GREATER LONDON) TRUST FUND
Received: On time
REV'D CANON NIGEL PATRICK NICHOLSON CF DL Trustee
None on record
Colonel DAVID KEVIN GEORGE COX OBE Trustee
BOOKHAM YOUTH AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £39.34k £33.83k £40.84k £39.57k £40.03k
Total expenditure £42.58k £25.65k £52.59k £36.12k £53.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 14 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 11 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 18 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 OAKDENE CLOSE
BOOKHAM
LEATHERHEAD
KT23 4PT
Phone:
07825354763
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available