BATTLE MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Halls to hire to the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 18 December 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Hodge MBE | Chair | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Lawson | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Reed | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Cllr David Russell | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert Dyer | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Emeleus | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT GEE optional | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Sherwood | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Waughman optional | Trustee | 12 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JILL GYNGELL | Trustee | 25 July 2016 |
|
|||||
GARY ROY DUNK | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER MILLS optional | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET MILLS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.25k | £42.47k | £45.73k | £49.19k | £53.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £140.83k | £39.08k | £57.27k | £50.61k | £51.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £30.52k | £16.38k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 13TH JANUARY 1994
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BATTLE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD IN THE COUNTY OF EAST SUSSEX WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BATTLE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
81 HIGH STREET
BATTLE
EAST SUSSEX
TN33 0AQ
- Phone:
- 01424 772044
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window