Financial history FAIRFIELD ROAD RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 305187
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.74k £7.29k £9.74k £9.74k £15.95k
Total expenditure £15.47k £9.02k £11.47k £11.47k £17.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A