Financial history ST JOHN'S PARK

Charity number: 305189
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £41.64k £40.89k £42.58k £56.23k £58.24k
Total expenditure £42.76k £45.59k £47.29k £60.93k £62.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A