FAIRWARP VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision and maintenance of village Hall, village green and play area in Fairwarp.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 17 January 1963: Standard registration
- FAIRWARP INSTITUTE AND READING ROOM (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Catherine Worlock Pope | Chair | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Sowter | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Brooker | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Maggott | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Feely | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Kenny | Trustee | 26 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Atchison | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Dewhurst | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Lazenby | Trustee | 27 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANITA LONG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.56k | £8.67k | £17.29k | £17.65k | £17.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.82k | £9.08k | £13.68k | £16.14k | £30.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.40k | N/A | £500 | £200 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 20 JANUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY: (A) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL, INCLUDING USE FOR: (I) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (II) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION; AND (B) THE MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP OF THE VILLAGE GREEN AND PLAY AREA IN FAIRWARP ON LAND THAT IS LEASED OR LICENSED TO THE COMMITTEE FOR THAT PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
THE VILLAGE OF FAIRWARP AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
White Cottage
Burnt Oak Road
High Hurstwood
UCKFIELD
TN22 4AE
- Phone:
- 07818603648
- Email:
- diandpetebowley@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window