Trustees FAIRWARP VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 305218

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Catherine Worlock Pope | Chair | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Sowter | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Brooker | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Maggott | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Feely | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Kenny | Trustee | 26 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Atchison | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Dewhurst | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Lazenby | Trustee | 27 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANITA LONG | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.