Financial history FLETCHING MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 305220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £6.76k £4.93k £8.40k £9.51k £9.86k
Total expenditure £4.18k £5.15k £5.99k £13.11k £3.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A