FLETCHING MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 305220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Village Hall is available for the inhabitants of the Parish of Fletching to meet and use the facilities available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £9,855
Total expenditure: £3,704

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 October 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FLETCHING VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Ranson Trustee 26 November 2015
None on record
DAVID HOLLINGS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £6.76k £4.93k £8.40k £9.51k £9.86k
Total expenditure £4.18k £5.15k £5.99k £13.11k £3.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 22 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 17 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 20 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 13 November 2021 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Stones
Fletching
UCKFIELD
TN22 3SS
Phone:
01825723913
Website:

No information available