Trustees ERIDGE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Austin Smith Chair 20 June 2021
THE BLUE LIGHT SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
Tracy Deborah Bryant Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Elizabeth Christiana Mary Shorter Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Richard Hayes Trustee 16 March 2025
None on record
Alexander James Shorter Trustee 06 March 2024
None on record
Julian Lloyd Trustee 11 March 2022
None on record
Ruth Wilkey Trustee 02 March 2021
None on record
Allison Holton Trustee 25 March 2020
None on record
Jonathan Lynn Trustee 25 March 2020
None on record
SUE HAWKES Trustee 20 March 2015
None on record