HOLLINGTON YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- East Sussex
Governance
- 27 January 1967: Standard registration
- 02 December 2004: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 02 December 2004: Funds transferred to 1101085 HOLLINGTON COMMUNITY CENTRE
- HOLLINGTON YOUTH CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14TH SEPTEMBER 1966 AS AMENDED 14TH AUGUST 1970, 5TH OCTOBER 1976 AND 30TH DECEMBER 1976
Charitable objects
A COMMUNITY CENTRE INCLUDING THEREIN A YOUTH CENTRE FOR THE RECREATION TRAINING AND EDUCATION OF ADULTS AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE DISTRICT OF HOLLINGTON IN THE COUNTY BOROUGH OF HASTINGS AND ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
HASTINGS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window