HASTINGS WEST HILL YOUTH CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth Club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 29 July 1963: Standard registration
- WEST HILL BOY'S CLUB (Previous name)
- WEST HILL YOUTH CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael White | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne White Secretary | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karl Moore chairman | Trustee | 11 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Micheala Moore Welfare | Trustee | 17 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN BOURNER | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
GARY WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID BISHOP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.54k | £18.30k | £22.88k | £9.35k | £21.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.96k | £5.88k | £16.53k | £16.70k | £20.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 August 2024 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 July 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 20 August 2020 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 3 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
1). TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS, WITH A PREFERENCE TO THOSE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT THROUGH THEIR LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO HELP THEM ACHIEVE THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY, SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. 2). SUBJECT TO CLAUSE 22 OF THIS SCHEME, THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR USE FOR THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF HASTINGS AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Reedswood Road
ST. LEONARDS-ON-SEA
East Sussex
TN38 8DN
- Phone:
- 07973346261
- Email:
- Karlmoore1981@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window