Financial history THE JARVIS BROOK MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 305270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £17.34k £16.48k £15.04k £7.02k £12.41k
Total expenditure £16.31k £9.43k £11.37k £38.60k £12.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £8.00k N/A N/A