MAYFIELD MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a village hall for the benifit of the inhabitants of the village of Mayfield.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 06 March 1963: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Les Wicker | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JANNA TODD | Trustee | 31 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ian Michael Bruce | Trustee | 07 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr BRIAN O'CONNOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN LANGFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR TONY WOODLIFFE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN PIKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHIRLEY HOLLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISSIE ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.40k | £16.40k | £10.70k | £10.66k | £1.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.32k | £17.32k | £15.51k | £13.39k | £3.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 SEPTEMBER 1978
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
MAYFIELD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHARNDEN LODGE
MAYFIELD
TN20 6PY
- Phone:
- 01435872400
- Email:
- twoodliffe@aol.com
- Website:
-
mayfieldmemorialhall.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window