POLEGATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sport/recreation/provides buildings/facilities/open space
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £6,645 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 19 October 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Louise Cotsford Bond | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Branch | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Dorothy Coleman | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Desmond Colin Alder | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Morrish | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ELLEN PAYNE | Trustee | 30 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
WENDY ROGERS | Trustee | 09 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Brian Watkinson | Trustee | 01 October 2009 |
|
|
||||
Joan Shoesmith | Trustee | 28 February 1991 |
|
|
||||
John Hollingworth | Trustee | 01 October 1975 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP CHARLES COLEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £164.02k | £104.45k | £35.70k | £105.53k | £126.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.41k | £109.56k | £75.15k | £122.56k | £129.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £31.76k | £5.82k | N/A | £6.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 10 August 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 10 August 2020 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH DECEMBER 1962, AS AMENDED 26TH NOVEMBER 1976 AND 18TH MAY 1993 AND 24TH NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF POLEGATE, EAST SUSSEX AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF, SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
POLEGATE, SUSSEX, AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Linked charities
- 19 October 1993 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
POLEGATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
54 WINDSOR WAY
POLEGATE
BN26 6QF
- Phone:
- 01323482434
- Email:
- POLEGATECC@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window