THE ROBERTSBRIDGE YOUTH CLUB

Charity Number: 305294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Youth Centre for young people of Robertsbridge & surrounding area

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £5,398
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 September 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
EAST SUSSEX COUNTY COUNCIL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.10k £746 £409 £2.13k £5.40k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CHILDREN'S SERVICES DEPARTMENT
PO BOX 4
COUNTY HALL
ST ANNE'S CRESCENT
LEWES
BN7 1SG
Phone:
01273481000
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available