SOUTH HEIGHTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 305309
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Village Hall

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £51,013
Total expenditure: £31,723

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 April 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROGER SCARLES Chair 14 June 2011
None on record
Teresa Pickstock Trustee 09 December 2024
None on record
Louise Baxter Trustee 19 June 2023
None on record
Phillipa McTiffen Trustee 13 May 2023
None on record
SOPHY CLARE THORPE Trustee 12 March 2004
None on record
CLARE DICKINS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.47k £8.56k £13.54k £31.05k £51.01k
Total expenditure £21.15k £5.79k £13.96k £26.86k £31.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 07 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
VALLEYVIEW
HEIGHTON ROAD
SOUTH HEIGHTON
NEWHAVEN
BN9 0JJ
Phone:
01273513106