STONE CROSS MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MAINTAINS HALL AND BUILDINGS TO FACILITATE COMMUNITY GROUPS USING THE AFOREMENTIONED HALL FOR ACTIVITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 22 October 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Blaker | Chair | 09 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN BECK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFREY BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAMELA BRITTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.98k | £27.56k | £37.82k | £23.94k | £24.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.64k | £23.42k | £24.17k | £33.28k | £38.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.38k | £20.40k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 11 OCTOBER 1963 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 19 OCTOBER 1989 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 10 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
WESTHAM AND HANKHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dittons Road
Stone Cross
BN245EL
- Phone:
- 07731869784
- Email:
- secretary@stonecrosshall.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window