Financial history FELPHAM MEMORIAL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305367
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.87k £19.02k £31.92k £25.20k £45.85k
Total expenditure £14.84k £15.43k £16.27k £33.79k £41.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £21.56k £400 N/A