SOUTHWICK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running an all-purpose community centre in the heart of Southwick, West Sussex, for a wide range of activities serving the local population.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 24 September 1962: Standard registration
- SOUTHWICK COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM GOUGH | Chair | 28 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBINA BAINE | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Brownings | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WOOLGAR | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE FAIR | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|||||
MAUREEN CRIPPS | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
RAY RICHARDS | Trustee | 27 June 2016 |
|
|||||
MARTIN OAKLEY | Trustee | 06 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP SIMONS | Trustee | 23 June 2014 |
|
|||||
JOHN GARLAND | Trustee | 28 January 2013 |
|
|||||
DAVID COMBER | Trustee | 27 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
BOB RYDER | Trustee |
|
||||||
SIMON P ARMES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £317.76k | £122.47k | £184.22k | £298.41k | £386.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £215.18k | £166.64k | £194.95k | £296.44k | £370.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £76.22k | £24.26k | £500 | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/03/1962 AS AMENDED ON 24/03/1976 AS AMENDED ON 15/07/1976 AS AMENDED ON 22/03/1989 AS AMENDED ON 22/07/1993 AS AMENDED ON 15/06/1998 AS AMENDED ON 25/06/2007 AS AMENDED ON 25/06/2012
Charitable objects
A. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTHWICK AND ITS IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD IN THE ADUR DISTRICT OF WEST SUSSEX (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR DISABILITY, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; B. TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE IN SOUTHWICK (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE COMMUNITY CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS; C. TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
SOUTHWICK AND FISHERGATE
Linked charities
- 24 September 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOUTHWICK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
24 SOUTHWICK STREET
SOUTHWICK
BRIGHTON
BN42 4TE
- Phone:
- 01273592819
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window