THE EMPIRE HALL GRAFFHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Empire Hall is a village hall for annual events (eg flower show/harvest supper/church Christmas fair/ Easter Market), village organisations (eg parish council, badminton, Lunch and Thursday Clubs) and weekly well being activities. Its stage hosts plays/films/concerts. It is bookable for parties, dances, meetings, classes and elections. It is an essential part of the fabric of the village.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 08 May 1963: Standard registration
- GRAFFHAM VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Blunt | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Lydiard-Wilson | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mary Charlesworth | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Carole Sargent | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Diane Bellis | Trustee | 09 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ann Brown | Trustee | 18 September 2004 |
|
|
||||
Karen Consalvi | Trustee | 18 September 2004 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Jacob | Trustee | 18 September 2004 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £178.90k | £44.64k | £36.17k | £17.04k | £31.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £179.63k | £49.04k | £13.33k | £13.64k | £37.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 17 OCTOBER 1962
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF GRAFFHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
GRAFFHAM AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Empire Hall
The Street
Graffham
PETWORTH
GU28 0QB
- Phone:
- 01798 867
- Email:
- empirehall@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window