HENFIELD VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 305377
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Letting of property (rooms) to trustees and public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income: £105,361
Total expenditure: £79,732
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
- West Sussex
Governance
Registration history:
- 15 January 1965: Standard registration
- 07 March 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 07 March 2024: Funds transferred to 1197873 THE HENFIELD HALL
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- THE HENFIELD HALL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.02k | £87.51k | £98.57k | £100.67k | £105.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.40k | £67.95k | £126.86k | £98.02k | £79.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.77k | £73.77k | £29.99k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 February 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 February 2023 | 13 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9TH DECEMBER 1964 AND SCHEME 29TH OCTOBER 1992
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
HENFIELD AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window