Trustees LAVANT MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 305390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Liz Goodey Trustee 02 April 2025
None on record
Alison Elizabeth Fordham Trustee 04 March 2025
None on record
Jessica Amy Riseborough Trustee 06 June 2023
None on record
Hilbre Marian Louise Tucker Trustee 06 December 2022
None on record
Maureen O'Grady Trustee 06 March 2020
None on record
DAVID JOHN KENT Trustee
None on record
MR RICHARD WIGNALL Trustee
None on record
ELAINE SHEPPARD Trustee
None on record
SHEILA MARY SIMS Trustee
None on record