Financial history NORTHCHAPEL VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 305397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.23k £14.11k £22.49k £13.10k £15.39k
Total expenditure £13.25k £13.64k £19.24k £17.71k £14.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £10.50k £10.00k £500 £500