NORTH MUNDHAM PLAYING FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main work of the charity is to maintain the playing field, sport facilities, pavilion and annexe for recreational use by people in the local area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 15 April 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER MONKTON | Chair |
|
||||||
Frances Neave | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Paul | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Annie Maclean | Trustee | 22 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
IAN PAUL CHIVERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.59k | £32.46k | £29.30k | £22.73k | £26.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.72k | £32.35k | £26.95k | £23.44k | £26.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £8.00k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 December 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 December 2022 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 January 2022 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 January 2022 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 5TH FEBRUARY 1971
Charitable objects
PLAYING FIELD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF NORTH MUNDHAM.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NORTH MUNDHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Meadow View
Vinnetrow Road
Runcton
CHICHESTER
West Sussex
PO20 1QB
- Phone:
- 01243774223
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window