HILLSIDE SCOUT CAMP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The camp site, of approximately 21 acres, continues to be used for outdoor scout activities by members of the Scout Districts in Hove to Shoreham area for whom the camp site was originally donated. In addition to that continued and regular usage the facilities at Hillside are also available and used by members of youth organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 22 November 1968: Standard registration
- 09 May 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 09 May 2016: Funds transferred to 305826 BRIGHTON & HOVE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
- "HILLSIDE" (Working name)
- HILLSIDE BOY SCOUTS CAMPING GROUND (Previous name)
- HILLSIDE SCOUTS CAMPING GROUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.72k | £6.47k | £17.07k | £15.48k | £17.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.01k | £0 | £11.55k | £12.19k | £16.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 09 May 2016 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 09 May 2016 | 464 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 31 July 2014 | 181 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17TH AUGUST 1935 AND SUPPLEMENTAL TRUST DEED DATED 31ST DECEMBER 1936.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE CAMPING AND TRAINING FACILITIES FOR BOY SCOUTS.
Area of benefit
SUSSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window