QUAYSIDE YOUTH CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Youth Centre open for any young person aged 13 - 25 years in the Adur Area. Activities at present include: Sports i.e. football, table tennis, pool, dodge ball; arts and crafts, dance, music, tv, junior leader training, educational training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- West Sussex
Governance
- 17 September 1963: Standard registration
- QUAYSIDE YOUTH CLUB (Previous name)
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maurice GALE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Andrew HILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY STUART | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.08k | £33.60k | £27.33k | £32.95k | £24.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.12k | £9.11k | £25.18k | £34.97k | £57.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | £6.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 September 2024 | 236 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 September 2024 | 236 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 March 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 March 2023 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17TH NOVEMBER 1960 AND AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 6TH APRIL 1998.
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A YOUTH CENTRE FOR THE PURPOSE OF HELPING AND EDUCATING YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE RESIDENT IN SOUTHWICK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID YOUNG PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
SOUTHWICK AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
QUAYSIDE YOUTH CLUB
UPPER KINGSTON LANE
SOUTHWICK
BRIGHTON
BN42 4RE
- Phone:
- 01273592809
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window