WARNHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is established to provide and maintain Warnham Village Hall for the benefit of the inhabitants of Warnham and the neighbourhood without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use for meetings, lectures and classes and for other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving the condition of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 25 October 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Martin | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith Barns | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Robinson | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Mathias | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Turfey | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ann LLoyd | Trustee | 08 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
LAVINA BENNETT | Trustee | 04 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET RICHMOND | Trustee | 04 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
BILL THORNTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFREY JOHN READ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WARNHAM PARISH COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAMELA FRANCZAK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.80k | £34.96k | £29.23k | £30.62k | £40.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.51k | £13.02k | £23.76k | £17.32k | £25.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.63k | £21.00k | £1.21k | N/A | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 05/11/1971 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 04/01/2013
Charitable objects
PROVISION & MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA.
Area of benefit
VILLAGE OF WARNHAM AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Farm Close
Warnham
Horsham
West Sussex
RH12 3QT
- Phone:
- 01403 790458
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window