WATERSFIELD PLAYING FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SPORTS FACILITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,600 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 27 September 1962: Standard registration
- ALBAN HEAD PLAYING FIELD COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GUY NELSON | Chair | 15 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Roger Robert Garland | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Francis Keith Evans | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Christopher Paul Glithero | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
DONA SHERLOCK-FUIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLDWALTHAM PARISH COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.00k | £5.92k | £9.16k | £8.32k | £11.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.60k | £5.41k | £8.23k | £11.98k | £6.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 29 JULY 1931 SCHEME DATED 22 APRIL 1932
Charitable objects
RECREATION GROUND
Area of benefit
PARISH OF COLDWALTHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
COLDWALTHAM PARISH COUNCIL
GREENDENE
STANE STREET
CODMORE HILL
PULBOROUGH
RH20 1BQ
- Phone:
- 01798873747
- Email:
- coldwalthampc@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window