Trustees ATWORTH VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 305461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WALLACE RICHARD CLARK Chair 10 March 2011
MELKSHAM AND DISTRICT LINK SCHEME
Received: On time
DAVID ALAN WINNIE Trustee 15 November 2023
None on record
SUSAN ELIZABETH WINNIE Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
ALDA SINCLAIR Trustee 11 March 2015
None on record
JANE ARTUS Trustee 17 April 2013
None on record
MORVEN EASTAUGH Trustee 15 April 2013
None on record