BISHOPS CANNINGS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Village Hall provides a location for local people to hold a variety of activities and the rent is kept as low as possible to cater for all needs.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £5,085
Total expenditure: £5,673

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 February 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CAROLINE PAMELA CUTTING Chair 12 March 2003
None on record
Jane Jameson Trustee 28 January 2020
None on record
Cathie Bell Trustee 26 January 2020
None on record
Susan Horton Trustee 28 November 2017
None on record
Elizabeth Jones Trustee 28 November 2017
None on record
ALISON MARY HUDD Trustee
None on record
JOHN BARRY HEFFER Trustee
BISHOP'S CANNINGS FEOFFEES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £7.85k £3.51k £7.17k £6.21k £5.09k
Total expenditure £5.10k £4.22k £7.85k £5.99k £5.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 06 February 2025 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 28 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 28 December 2023 326 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 17 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 12 March 2021 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
40 Fruitfields Close
Devizes
SN10 5JY
Phone:
01380723338
Website:

No information available