THE TOMMY CROKER MEMORIAL PLAYING FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To ensure sufficient and adequate playing opportunities for the children of the popular village of Cherhill in Wiltshire. The fields are maintained by volunteers to provide a clean, safe and enjoyable environment for children, their parents and grandparents alike. Fund raising is vital to ensure there are sufficient monies for repairs & maintenance and for replacement and/or new equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 24 April 1963: Standard registration
- THE TOMMY CROKER RECREATION AREA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Jackson | Chair | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Taylor | Trustee | 02 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas David Paget | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gareth David Elwell | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julian Muscott | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Jane Muscott | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Lynch | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Bliss | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas James White | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Bliss | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £665 | £0 | £448 | £2.97k | £3.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.22k | £2.77k | £0 | £2.06k | £1.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 07 February 2022 | 160 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 03 March 2021 | 184 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15TH JANUARY 1953
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF A CHILDREN'S PLAYING FIELD
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CHERHILL AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Mill Lane
Cherhill
CALNE
Wiltshire
SN11 8XS
- Phone:
- 01249822090
- Email:
- tommycrokermpf@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window