CHITTERNE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Village Hall for benefit of residents of Chitterne
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 25 February 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL PIKE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lexa Turner | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Wilkinson | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Jackie Bull | Trustee | 07 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Lucas | Trustee | 11 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS SOO LEE | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
JO BOOTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ERIKA SNOWDON-PIKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.31k | £2.36k | £3.31k | £9.06k | £17.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.20k | £2.37k | £8.71k | £8.11k | £12.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 19 January 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF GIFT DATED 31ST JANUARY 1950
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
CHITTERNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Green
Chitterne
Warminster
Wiltshire
BA12 0LL
- Phone:
- 01985851785
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window