Financial history THE COLLINGBOURNE KINGSTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 305494
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £14.57k £21.11k £17.19k £6.36k £7.75k
Total expenditure £7.10k £6.03k £10.16k £9.53k £13.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £18.78k £2.67k N/A N/A