Financial history DINTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 305502
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.99k £14.72k £16.04k £10.39k £10.76k
Total expenditure £12.62k £3.91k £12.15k £15.10k £11.30k
Income from government contracts £744 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.53k £8.00k N/A N/A