Accounts and annual returns DOWNTON MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 305507
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 December 2021 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 April 2020 179 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 June 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required