Financial history EASTERTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305510
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £21.15k £60.39k £41.71k £9.10k £9.03k
Total expenditure £7.59k £46.17k £63.96k £6.17k £7.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £16.73k N/A N/A