Trustees EASTERTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 305510

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KIERAN PIERCE | Chair | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jane Ross Hardman | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Harman | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heather Walker | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Mary Hamilton | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Raine Yvonne Green | Trustee | 28 July 2010 |
|
|
||||
COL DAVID BERNARD GREEN | Trustee | 28 July 2010 |
|
|
||||
MR CHRIS SAUNDERS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.