Financial history GREAT BEDWYN PLAYINGFIELD AND VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.99k £34.14k £63.38k £12.95k £102.43k
Total expenditure £13.42k £24.54k £9.90k £18.66k £142.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £26.74k £11.60k N/A £48.00k