GREAT CHEVERELL VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Book Club Gardening Club Whist Games (Held in Village Hall) Bingo Friends Neighbours Old Peoples Tea (Monthly) Keep Fit Childrens Parties , Arts Festival, Church Bazarr. Action for children. Also Yoga. Friends and Neighbours.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 28 April 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Peter Bland | Chair | 19 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Hosmer Aldersey-Williams | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
JANE ANDREW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.58k | £130 | £3.41k | £14.69k | £1.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.88k | £1.28k | £1.64k | £1.24k | £4.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 February 2022 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 10TH FEBRUARY 1964
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF GREAT CHEVERELL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR ORTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
GREAT CHEVERELL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
90 High Street
GREAT CHEVERELL
DEVIZES
SN10 5XR
- Phone:
- 07881374664
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window